Evans, Peter Douglas (CPSO#: 58182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
737 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E3
Phone: (519) 578-1320
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter D. Evans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Evans ( CPSO# 58182 )

Business Address:
737 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E3
Phone Number: (519) 578-1320

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DOUGLAS EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988