Evans, Robyn Marie (CPSO#: 61218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone: (416) 256-4707
Fax: (416) 256-4710
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Wound Clinic
5Th Floor
76 Grrenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6407
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.M. Evans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2014

Dr. R. Evans ( CPSO# 61218 )

Business Address:
Unit 200
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 256-4707

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ROBYN MARIE EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990