Evans, Terry Roger (CPSO#: 81336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Emergency Department
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Nov 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY ROGER EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2007