Everett, Andrew Edwin (CPSO#: 78730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Home Street
Brockville ON  K6V 0A5
Phone: (613) 423-1111
Fax: (613) 423-1112
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

244 King Street West
Brockville ON  K6V 3R9
Canada
Phone: (613) 423-2424
Fax: (613) 423-2525
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Everett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Everett ( CPSO# 78730 )

Business Address:
244 King Street West
Brockville ON  K6V 3R9
Phone Number: (613) 423-2424

Business Address:
5 Home Street
Brockville ON  K6V 0A5
Phone Number: (613) 423-1111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW EDWIN EVERETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVERETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2002