Everson, Edward Alexander (CPSO#: 72632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Glen Erin Family Medicine Clinic
2318 Dunwin Dr., Unit 11
Mississauga, ON
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C7
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-1145
Fax: (905) 828-1144
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward A. Everson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Everson ( CPSO# 90780 )
Dr. E. Everson ( CPSO# 72632 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Glen Erin Family Medicine Clinic
Suite 11
2318 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C7
Phone Number: (905) 828-1145

Business Address:
Summerville FM Teaching Unit
101 Queensway West
7th Floor
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD ALEXANDER EVERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003