Evoy, Olga Louise (CPSO#: 69108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital- O.C.
Hospitalist Office
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444 Ext. 3319
Fax: (519) 973-4897
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Evoy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Evoy ( CPSO# 69108 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLGA LOUISE EVOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVOY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997