Ewart, Robert Mansfield (CPSO#: 27550)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997