Ewaschuk, Ernest John (CPSO#: 27344)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: ISIS Regional Fertility Centre 2180 Meadowvale Boulevard Mississauga ON L5N 5S3
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015