Ewing-Bui, Tinh David (CPSO#: 77062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
260-865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 671-5249
Fax: (705) 671-5460
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tinh David Ewing-Bui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ewing-Bui ( CPSO# 77062 )

Business Address:
260 - 865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 671-5249

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINH DAVID EWING-BUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EWING-BUI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 2, 2018, Dr. Ewing has completed all aspects of the SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)