Ewing-Chow, David Anthony (CPSO#: 65756)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jan 2016