Exner, Derek Vincent (CPSO#: 62346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GE 63 - 3280 Hospital Drive NW
Calgary AB  T2N 4Z6
Phone: 4032203219

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK VINCENT EXNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EXNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Apr 1995 to 04 May 1995
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991