Eyjolfson, Ronald Clayton Eysteinn (CPSO#: 23580)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Icelandic

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 8, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 15, 2010, Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre notified the College that Dr. Ronald Clayton Eysteinn Eyjolfson's privileges were suspended from September 8, 2010 to September 29, 2010.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012