Ezekwem, Victor Chidi (CPSO#: 96776)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo

Education:UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Ezekwem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 12 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 101 Erie Street East, Windsor, ON, N9A 3W9
Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of their medical records may contact: Dr. Victor Ezekwem c/o Dr. Segun Omoseni
Date Received: 18 Oct 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015