Sargolzaei, Fatemeh (CPSO#: 93341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Intercommunity Health Centre
Suite 7
1355 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 1R9
Canada
Phone: (519) 659-6399
Fax: (519) 659-9930
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Sargolzaei Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Business Address:
1355 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 1R9
Phone Number: (519) 659-6399


Corporation Name: Dixon Fox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cunningham-Dunlop ( CPSO# 103184)
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )
Dr. B. Yemchuk ( CPSO# 51884 )
Dr. P. Fox ( CPSO# 57143 )
Dr. D. Dixon ( CPSO# 65384 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATEMEH SARGOLZAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARGOLZAEI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012