Fabbro, Julie Federica (CPSO#: 55868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Headdon Gate
Unit 10
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 8A3
Phone: (905) 770-5661
Fax: (905) 770-3381
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE FEDERICA FABBRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FABBRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 03 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989