Fabian, Jacqueline (CPSO#: 88402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 482-6363
Fax: (416) 482-9229
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Fabian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fabian ( CPSO# 88402 )

Business Address:
400 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE FABIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FABIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010