Fabian, Jaroslav Christopher (CPSO#: 95278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaroslav Christopher Fabian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fabian ( CPSO# 95278 )

Business Address:
The Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAROSLAV CHRISTOPHER FABIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FABIAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017