Fabian, Michael Clifford (CPSO#: 65704)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Clifford Fabian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012