Fabisiak, Krzysztof Janusz (CPSO#: 62857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 May 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside South FHO
665 C Earl Armstrong
Ottawa ON  K1V 2G2
Phone: (613) 822-1399
Fax: (613) 822-0411
Electoral District: 07

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  March  3,  2011,  the  following  is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration  held  by Dr. Krzysztof Fabisiak,
            in  accordance with an undertaking and consent given by  Dr.  Fabisiak  to  the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective  immediately,   I  have voluntarily relinquished my prescribing
                  privileges  with  respect  to  the   following   drugs,   substances  and
                  preparations: Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations with the exception of
                  Tylenol  2  and  Tylenol  3,  Controlled Drugs, and Benzodiazepines/Other
                  Targeted Substances under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act.