Faclier, Gil (CPSO#: 29502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

240 duncan mills road
Toronto ON  M2L 2R6
Canada
Phone: (416) 840-5990
Fax: (647) 427-4100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

womens college hospital
76 grenville st
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6269
Fax: (416) 323-2666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gil Faclier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Faclier ( CPSO# 29502 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook & Women's College Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M3-200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5989

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIL FACLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FACLIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1977