Fadeel, Khalid Saleh (CPSO#: 88136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malvern Medical Center
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ROUGE VALLEY HEALTH CARE SYSTEM
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4E9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7270
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khalid Fadeel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fadeel ( CPSO# 88136 )

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Center
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Business Address:
580 Hardwood Avenue South
Emergency Department
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health Care System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Emergency Department
Toronto ON  M1E 2B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID SALEH FADEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADEEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 29, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)