Fagan, Susan Margaret (CPSO#: 68047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: Bruneau, Susan Margaret Fagan (used until: 26 Jun 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiology Consultants
101-99 AIRPORT ROAD
St John's NL  A1A 4Y3
Phone: (709) 726-5311
Fax: (709) 726-1028

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARGARET FAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jul 1994 to 31 Jul 1994
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1996