Fageeh, Nasser Ali Yousef (CPSO#: 63336)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Jan 1995
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1995