Faghfoury, Hannaneh (CPSO#: 80910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fred A Litwin Family Centre
for Genetic Medicine
60 Murray St, BOX 34
3rd floor, room 400
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4220
Fax: (416) 619-5523
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hannaneh Faghfoury Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Faghfoury ( CPSO# 80910 )

Business Address:
Fred A Litwin Family Centre
for Genetic Medicine
60 Murray St, BOX 34
3rd floor, room 400
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNANEH FAGHFOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAGHFOURY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010