Faheim, Enass (CPSO#: 80602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 312
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 828-6666
Fax: (905) 819-8317
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENASS FAHEIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAHEIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2004