Fahim, Simone Sami Ishac (CPSO#: 75433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
224 Hunt Club Road, Unit 4
Ottawa ON  K1V 1C1
Phone: (613) 248-1010
Fax: (613) 248-1019
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Rheumatology-Dermatology Clinic
Riverside Campus
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Simone Fahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fahim ( CPSO# 75433 )

Business Address:
4 - 224 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 1C1
Phone Number: (613) 248-1010

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMONE SAMI ISHAC FAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005