Fahmy, Yousef Wadi (CPSO#: 76582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A301
3020 Thomas Street
Mississauga ON  L5M 0R4
Phone: (905) 858-7337
Fax: (905) 858-7338
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yousef Fahmy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Fahmy ( CPSO# 76582 )

Business Address:
Suite A301
3020 Thomas Street
Mississauga ON  L5M 0R4
Phone Number: (905) 858-7337

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUSEF WADI FAHMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAHMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2004