Fahy, James Francis Anthony (CPSO#: 60398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
306 First Street
Midland ON  L4R 3N9
Phone: (705) 527-0105
Fax: (705) 527-6699
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Waypoint
A-109 Administration Building
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Canada
Phone: (705) 549-3181
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James F. Fahy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 4 2016


Corporation Name: James F. Fahy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fahy ( CPSO# 60398 )

Business Address:
306 First Street
Midland ON  L4R 3N9
Phone Number: (705) 527-0105

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 24, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 24, 2017, Georgian Bay General Hospital notified the College that Dr. James Fahy will resign his privileges at Georgian Bay General Hospital effective January 31, 2018, at which time an ongoing investigation by Georgian Bay General Hospital into Dr. Fahy’s care provided to an ICU patient will be closed. In the interim until his resignation, Dr. Fahy has voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges relating to the on-call schedule and will continue with out-patient procedures.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES FRANCIS ANTHONY FAHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAHY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1988