Faingold, Ricardo (CPSO#: 75342)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2002