Fairfield, John Alfred (CPSO#: 27455)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 307 1062 Ghislain Street Hawesbury, ON K6A 3B2
Date Received: 09 Feb 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Dec 2015