Fairfull Smith, Robert John (CPSO#: 27986)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Fairfull-Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 488 Carlingview, Toronto, ON M9W 6M8
Instructions: Ottawa Hospital & File Bank
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015