Fakim, Abid (CPSO#: 27798)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abid Fakim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: All medical records for Dr. Fakim's patients have been transferred to Dr. Shreyas Rana. Patients may contact Dr. Rana's office to complete a request form for Docudavit Solutions.The office address and contact information is as follows: Suite 1 A 595 Ontario Road Welland ON L3B 0B3 Phone: 905-735-5627 Fax: 905-735-5628
Date Received: 24 Jul 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Mauritius

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2016