Falk, Michael James (CPSO#: 80155)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2014