Falkson, Conrad Bif (CPSO#: 76042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 28 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Oncology
CCSEO at KHSC
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4509
Fax: (613) 548-1355
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8P 5A9
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. W. Mackillop ( CPSO# 32028 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Conrad B. Falkson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8P 5A9

Business Address:
Kingston Regional Cancer Centre
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2630

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Mar 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONRAD BIF FALKSON may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF ONCOLOGY, QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. FALKSON holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. FALKSON may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. FALKSON no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. FALKSON no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. FALKSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2005
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Jun 2005