Fallis, George Walter Bouck (CPSO#: 32189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE WALTER BOUCK FALLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1983