Fallis, Shari Lynn (CPSO#: 57970)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2003