Fallon, Katherine Mary (CPSO#: 71276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Operating Room
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6485
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine Fallon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fallon ( CPSO# 71276 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hosptial
Operating Room
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6485

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE MARY FALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999