Famorca, Leilani Casilda de Leon (CPSO#: 85121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:SAINT LOUIS UNIVERSITY, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
336 Bronte Street South
Suite 223
Milton ON  L9T 7W6
Phone: (289) 851-0774
Fax: (289) 851-0776
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

711 Concession St.
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42500
Fax: (905) 389-3293
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEILANI CASILDA DE LEON FAMORCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAMORCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010