Fan, Eddy Pey Ti (CPSO#: 76116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
PMB 11-123
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-5483
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fan ( CPSO# 76116 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite PMB 11-123
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDDY PEY TI FAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005