Fan, Jonathan Justin Earl (CPSO#: 100677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Middlefield Medical Centre
8 Shadlock Street
Markham ON  L3S3K9
Phone: 905-471-8980
Fax: 905-471-9352
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Fan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fan ( CPSO# 100677)

Business Address:
Middlefield Medical Centre
8 Shadlock Street
Markham ON  L3S 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 471-8980

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN JUSTIN EARL FAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015