Fan-Lun, Melissa Amy (CPSO#: 86338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Fan-Lun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fan-Lun ( CPSO# 86338 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA AMY FAN-LUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAN-LUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012