Fanaras, Effie (CPSO#: 82608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church St., Suite G06
Markham, ON
L6B 1A1
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone: 905-554-5004
Fax: 905-554-7150
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
Division of Respirology
102 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Canada
Phone: 613-548-2379
Fax: 613-549-1459
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Centre For Respiratory Health
377 Church St
Suite G07
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7614
Fax: 905-472-7618
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EFFIE FANARAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANARAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009