Fantaneanu, Tadeu Andrei (CPSO#: 91037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fantaneanu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Fantaneanu ( CPSO# 91037 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hosptial - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 789-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TADEU ANDREI FANTANEANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTANEANU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2016