Fantus, Ivan George (CPSO#: 30072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Lebovic Building
Suite 5-028
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8665
Fax: (416) 361-2657
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ivan George Fantus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fantus ( CPSO# 30072 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Lebovic Building 5th Floor Room 5028
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-8665

Business Address:
500 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVAN GEORGE FANTUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1978