Faqeeh, Ali Ahmad M (CPSO#: 108128)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2015 to 23 Jan 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2017