Faraawi, Rafat Yousif (CPSO#: 54899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: El-Faraawi, Raafat Yousif Mahmoud Abbass (used until: 12 Sep 1988 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Apartment 201
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 742-4430
Fax: (519) 742-4231
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 201
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-4430
Fax: (519) 742-4231
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faraawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Faraawi ( CPSO# 54899 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
564 Belmount Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 742-4430

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAFAT YOUSIF FARAAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAAWI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1988