Faraci, Maria (CPSO#: 60845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Suite 212 150 Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1L 8H2
Date Received: 03 Aug 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA FARACI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARACI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993