Farag, Ashraf Mohamed Dakhil (CPSO#: 88110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Abdullah University hospital
Princess Nourah University
Riyadh 11552
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966552689813
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 15199734411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor cardiac centre
130 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Canada
Phone: 15192504449
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHRAF MOHAMED DAKHIL FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Mar 2008 to 02 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2012