Farag, George Abdalla Reyad (CPSO#: 86741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardio Cor Cardiology And
Arrhythmia Clinic
Suite 2
714 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X6
Phone: (519) 541-0030
Fax: (519) 339-0993
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London cardiac institute
256 Pall Mall st suite #302
London ON  N6A5P6
Canada
Phone: 5196450146
Fax: 5196451584
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-8472
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GA Farag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Farag ( CPSO# 86741 )

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
Suite 301
256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Business Address:
198 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3131

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE ABDALLA REYAD FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 29 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012