Farag, Naguib Nader Naguib (CPSO#: 94656)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Feb 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 04 Feb 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 2016